Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2020, and the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2013, 2014, 2016, 2017, and 2019
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Administration)
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Budget and Taxation
Analysis
Synopsis
Authorizing the creation of a State Debt in the amount of One Billion, One Hundred and Four Million, One Hundred Fourteen Thousand Dollars ($1,104,114,000), the proceeds to be used for certain necessary building, construction, demolition, planning, renovation, conversion, replacement, and capital equipment purchases of the State, for acquiring certain real estate in connection therewith, and for grants to certain subdivisions and other organizations for certain development and improvement purposes; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0151
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2020, June 1, 2021, June 1, 2022, June 1, 2023
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2020
Legislative Date
1/15/2020
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/15/2020 1/15/2020 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Creation of a State Debt - Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2020, and the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2013, 2014, 2016, 2017, and 2019
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2013, 2014, 2015, 2016, 2017, 2018, 2019 )
Last Updated: 1/23/2020 7:52 PM