Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2020, and the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2013, 2014, 2016, 2017, and 2019
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Administration)
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 537
Analysis
Attorney General's Review Letter
Synopsis
Authorizing the creation of a State Debt in the amount of One Billion, One Hundred and Eight Million, One Hundred Fourteen Thousand Dollars ($1,108,114,000), the proceeds to be used for certain necessary building, construction, demolition, planning, renovation, conversion, replacement, and capital equipment purchases of the State, for acquiring certain real estate in connection therewith, and for grants to certain subdivisions and other organizations for certain development and improvement purposes; etc.
Committees
Opposite:
Appropriations
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0151
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2020, June 1, 2021, June 1, 2022, June 1, 2023
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2020
Legislative Date
1/15/2020
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Report - Senate - Committee Report - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Reprint - Senate - Committee Reprint - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/17/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Committee Amendment (#1) Adopted
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Committee Amendment (#2-7) Adopted
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Committee Amendment (#8-18) Adopted
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Committee Amendment (#19-24) Adopted
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Committee Amendment (#25-112) Adopted
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Committee Amendment (#113-114) Adopted
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Committee Amendment (#115-139) Adopted
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Adopted
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Report - House - Committee Report - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Reprint - House - Committee Reprint - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/18/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate McIntosh) Adopted (126-6)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (122-9)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53C
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 537
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/15/2020 1/15/2020 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Creation of a State Debt - Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2020, and the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2013, 2014, 2016, 2017, and 2019
Report - Senate - Committee Report - Budget and Taxation
Reprint - Senate - Committee Reprint - Budget and Taxation
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/17/2020 3/17/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable with Amendments 51A
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Committee Amendment (#1) Adopted 51A
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Committee Amendment (#2-7) Adopted 51A
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Committee Amendment (#8-18) Adopted 51A
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Committee Amendment (#19-24) Adopted 51A
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Committee Amendment (#25-112) Adopted 51A
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Committee Amendment (#113-114) Adopted 51A
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Committee Amendment (#115-139) Adopted 51A
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable with Amendments Adopted 51A
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 51A
Text - Third - Creation of a State Debt - Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2020, and the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2013, 2014, 2016, 2017, and 2019
Senate 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 52
House 3/17/2020 3/14/2020 Referred Appropriations 51
Report - House - Committee Report - Appropriations
Reprint - House - Committee Reprint - Appropriations
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 3/18/2020 3/18/2020 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 3/18/2020 3/16/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 53
House 3/18/2020 3/16/2020 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate McIntosh) Adopted (126-6) 53
House 3/18/2020 3/16/2020 Third Reading Passed (122-9) 53
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Returned Passed 53C
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 537
Text - Chapter - Creation of a State Debt - Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2020, and the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2013, 2014, 2016, 2017, and 2019
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2013, 2014, 2015, 2016, 2017, 2018, 2019 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:54 PM