Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Anne Arundel County - Turkey Hunting - Fall Season
Sponsored by
Senator Reilly
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Natural Resources to establish by regulation a fall turkey season for the portion of Anne Arundel County lying south of MD Route 214; and requiring the dates and bag limits for the fall turkey season established under the Act to be consistent with the dates and bag limits established for the fall turkey season in Allegany County, Garrett County, and Washington County.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0196
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/14/2014
Legislative Date
1/15/2014
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2014
Legislative Date
1/15/2014
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 1:45 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2014
Legislative Date
1/28/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2014
Legislative Date
2/10/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/14/2014 1/15/2014 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/15/2014 1/15/2014 Hearing 1/28 at 1:45 p.m.
Senate 1/28/2014 1/28/2014 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/07/2014 2/10/2014 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM