Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Voters' Rights Protection Act of 2015
Sponsored by
Senator Pinsky
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the Attorney General to institute an action in a circuit court for injunctive relief to prohibit a person from engaging in or continuing to engage in specified violations of election law, except in specified circumstances; authorizing the State Prosecutor to seek injunctive relief in specified circumstances in which the Attorney General is prohibited from seeking injunctive relief under the Act; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0073
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2015
Legislative Date
2/02/2015
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2015
Legislative Date
2/04/2015
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/11/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {954536/1
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Special Order until later today (Senator Pinsky) Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {954536/1
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Motion Special Order until 4/13 (Senator Hough) Rejected (21-25)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/05/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-1)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/07/2015
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
68
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2015 2/02/2015 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/04/2015 2/04/2015 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/10/2015 4/11/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/11/2015 4/04/2015 Favorable with Amendments {954536/1 62
Senate 4/11/2015 4/04/2015 Special Order until later today (Senator Pinsky) Adopted 62
Senate 4/11/2015 4/04/2015 Favorable with Amendments {954536/1 62
Senate 4/11/2015 4/04/2015 Motion Special Order until 4/13 (Senator Hough) Rejected (21-25) 62
Senate 4/11/2015 4/04/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted 62
Senate 4/11/2015 4/04/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62
Senate 4/13/2015 4/05/2015 Third Reading Passed (46-1) 63
House 4/13/2015 4/07/2015 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 68
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   16-1003, 16-201 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM