Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Military Compensation
Sponsored by
Senators Waugh and Peters
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/03 at 2:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering a subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax for specified military compensation to repeal a requirement that the compensation be attributable to military service of the individual outside the United States; repealing a specified limitation on the amount of the subtraction modification; and applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2015.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0691
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/19/2016
Legislative Date
1/20/2016
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2016
Legislative Date
1/21/2016
Action
Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2016
Legislative Date
1/27/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2016
Legislative Date
1/27/2016
Action
Hearing 2/03 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/19/2016 1/20/2016 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/21/2016 1/21/2016 Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/27/2016 1/27/2016 Hearing cancelled
Senate 1/27/2016 1/27/2016 Hearing 2/03 at 2:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-207 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM