Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Calculation of Taxable Income - Itemized Deductions - Property Taxes
Sponsored by
Senators Serafini, Bates, Cassilly, Eckardt, Edwards, Hershey, Hough, Jennings, Norman, Reilly, Salling, Simonaire, and Waugh
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Allowing an individual, under certain circumstances, to increase the amount of itemized deductions used to determine Maryland taxable income by the amount of certain real or personal property taxes paid by the individual and not included as part of the individual's federal itemized deductions; and applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2017.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0587
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2018
Legislative Date
1/17/2018
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Calculation of Taxable Income - Itemized Deductions - Property Taxes
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/17/2018 1/17/2018 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Calculation of Taxable Income - Itemized Deductions - Property Taxes
Senate 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-218 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM