Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Anne Arundel County - Liquor Licenses - Transfer of License
Sponsored by
Senator Reilly
Status
In the House - First Reading Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the Board of License Commissioners for Anne Arundel County to allow an approved applicant to transfer an alcoholic beverages license to other premises within one-half mile of the premises for which the license was issued if the premises is substantially destroyed by fire, explosion, or catastrophe, taken by condemnation, taken by the exercise of the power of eminent domain, or no longer leased by the license holder due to the delay of a court case or other administrative process delay; etc.
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: HB0536
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2020
Legislative Date
1/15/2020
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Anne Arundel County - Liquor Licenses - Transfer of License
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {974630/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Anne Arundel County - Liquor Licenses - Transfer of License
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-1)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
47B
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/15/2020 1/15/2020 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Anne Arundel County - Liquor Licenses - Transfer of License
Senate 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/11/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/11/2020 3/06/2020 Favorable with Amendments {974630/1 Adopted 45
Senate 3/11/2020 3/06/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45
Text - Third - Anne Arundel County - Liquor Licenses - Transfer of License
Senate 3/13/2020 3/08/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-1) 47
House 3/13/2020 3/10/2020 Referred Economic Matters 47B
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 4/1/2020 10:17 AM