Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Hospitals - Notice to Patients - Outpatient Status and Billing Implications
Sponsored by
Senators Kelley, Astle, Benson, Forehand, Glassman, Jacobs, Jones-Rodwell, Kittleman, Mathias, Middleton, Pugh, and Rosapepe
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 202
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a hospital, under specified circumstances, to provide notice to a patient of the patient's outpatient status, the billing implications of the outpatient status, and the impact of the outpatient status on the patient's eligibility for Medicare rehabilitation services; and requiring the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene, in consultation with specified hospitals, to adopt by regulation standardized elements to be included in a written notice.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1062
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2013
Legislative Date
1/18/2013
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/18/2013
Legislative Date
1/18/2013
Action
Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2013
Legislative Date
2/04/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2013
Legislative Date
2/05/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {927673/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
18
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2013
Legislative Date
2/05/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
18
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2013
Legislative Date
2/07/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
20
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
23
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2013
Legislative Date
3/13/2013
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
60A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
60A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/02/2013
Legislative Date
5/02/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 202
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/17/2013 1/18/2013 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/18/2013 1/18/2013 Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/04/2013 2/04/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 2/05/2013 2/05/2013 Favorable with Amendments {927673/1 Report Adopted 18
Senate 2/05/2013 2/05/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 18
Senate 2/07/2013 2/07/2013 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 20
House 2/08/2013 2/08/2013 First Reading Health and Government Operations 23
House 3/13/2013 3/13/2013 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/01/2013 4/02/2013 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/02/2013 3/27/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 60A
House 4/02/2013 3/27/2013 Second Reading Passed 60A
House 4/04/2013 3/29/2013 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 62
Senate 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Returned Passed 61A
Post Passage 5/02/2013 5/02/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 202
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   19-349.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM