Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Mental Health - Voluntary and Involuntary Admissions - Assent and Certification by Psychiatric Nurse Practitioners
Sponsored by
Senators Eckardt and Reilly
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 330
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the circumstances under which a specified unit of a State facility may admit a minor under a specified provision of law for the treatment of a mental disorder to allow for the assent to the admission to be made by a psychiatric nurse practitioner and a physician; altering the requirement that a certificate accompany an application for involuntary admission to a facility or Veterans' Administration hospital under specified provisions of law to allow for a psychiatric nurse practitioner to complete a certificate; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2015
Legislative Date
2/02/2015
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2015
Legislative Date
2/03/2015
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2015
Legislative Date
3/03/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2015
Legislative Date
3/04/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
35
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2015
Legislative Date
3/04/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
35
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/06/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
37
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2015
Legislative Date
3/09/2015
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
39
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/11/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/07/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-1)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 330
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2015 2/02/2015 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/03/2015 2/03/2015 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/27/2015 3/03/2015 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/04/2015 3/04/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 35
Senate 3/04/2015 3/04/2015 Second Reading Passed 35
Senate 3/06/2015 3/06/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 37
House 3/09/2015 3/09/2015 First Reading Health and Government Operations 39
House 3/18/2015 3/18/2015 Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/10/2015 4/11/2015 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/11/2015 4/06/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 67
House 4/11/2015 4/06/2015 Second Reading Passed 67
House 4/13/2015 4/07/2015 Third Reading Passed (138-1) 68
Senate 4/13/2015 4/06/2015 Returned Passed 64
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 330
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-610, 10-615, 10-616 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM