Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Carroll County - State's Attorney's Office and Child Support Enforcement Administration - Transfer of Personnel
Sponsored by
Senators Ready and Bates
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 53
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Transferring the Child Support Unit of the Office of the State's Attorney for Carroll County to the Child Support Enforcement Administration of the Department of Human Resources; requiring that the employees be transferred in accordance with specified provisions of law; requiring that specified transferred employees be given credit with the State for years of county employment for purposes of determining specified retirement eligibility and also be subject to specified benefit selections in the Employees' Pension System; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Appropriations  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0194
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/19/2016
Legislative Date
1/20/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2016
Legislative Date
1/20/2016
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/18/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2016
Legislative Date
2/19/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {257473/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
27
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2016
Legislative Date
2/19/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
27
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2016
Legislative Date
2/23/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
29
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2016
Legislative Date
2/24/2016
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
31
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2016
Legislative Date
3/02/2016
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/12/2016
Legislative Date
4/12/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 53
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/19/2016 1/20/2016 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/20/2016 1/20/2016 Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/17/2016 2/18/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 2/19/2016 2/19/2016 Favorable with Amendments {257473/1 Report Adopted 27
Senate 2/19/2016 2/19/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 27
Senate 2/23/2016 2/23/2016 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 29
House 2/24/2016 2/24/2016 First Reading Appropriations 31
House 3/02/2016 3/02/2016 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/30/2016 3/31/2016 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 3/31/2016 3/26/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 58
House 3/31/2016 3/26/2016 Second Reading Passed 58
House 4/01/2016 3/27/2016 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 59
Senate 4/04/2016 3/29/2016 Returned Passed 58
Post Passage 4/12/2016 4/12/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 53
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-117 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM