Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Life Without Parole - Imposition
Sponsored by
Senators Kelley, Benson, Conway, Currie, Feldman, Ferguson, Guzzone, Kagan, Kasemeyer, King, Lee, Madaleno, Manno, McFadden, Middleton, Muse, Nathan-Pulliam, Peters, Pinsky, Ramirez, Robinson, Rosapepe, Smith, and Young
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a court from imposing a sentence of life imprisonment without the possibility of parole on an individual who was under the age of 18 years at the time the offense was committed.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0401
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0259 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/18/2017
Legislative Date
1/18/2017
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Life Without Parole - Imposition
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/18/2017
Legislative Date
1/18/2017
Action
Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2017
Legislative Date
1/24/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2017
Legislative Date
1/24/2017
Action
Hearing 2/01 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2017
Legislative Date
2/06/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/18/2017 1/18/2017 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Life Without Parole - Imposition
Senate 1/18/2017 1/18/2017 Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/24/2017 1/24/2017 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/24/2017 1/24/2017 Hearing 2/01 at 3:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/06/2017 2/06/2017 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   1-402 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM