Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Estates and Trusts - Family Allowance
Sponsored by
Senator Frosh
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 204
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing the allowance for a surviving spouse of a decedent from $5,000 to $10,000; and increasing the allowance for an unmarried minor child of a decedent from $2,500 to $5,000.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2013
Legislative Date
1/18/2013
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/18/2013
Legislative Date
1/18/2013
Action
Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2013
Legislative Date
2/05/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
19
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
19
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
21
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2013
Legislative Date
2/11/2013
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
24
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2013
Legislative Date
2/26/2013
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/02/2013
Legislative Date
5/02/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 204
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/17/2013 1/18/2013 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/18/2013 1/18/2013 Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/01/2013 2/05/2013 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 19
Senate 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Second Reading Passed 19
Senate 2/08/2013 2/08/2013 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 21
House 2/11/2013 2/11/2013 First Reading Judiciary 24
House 2/26/2013 2/26/2013 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/02/2013 4/03/2013 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 4/03/2013 3/28/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 61
House 4/03/2013 3/28/2013 Second Reading Passed 61
House 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 63
Senate 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 5/02/2013 5/02/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 204
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM