Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Telemedicine
Sponsored by
Senators Pugh, Benson, Conway, Forehand, Jones-Rodwell, King, Manno, Mathias, Montgomery, Muse, Peters, and Pinsky
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 141
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring, to the extent authorized by federal law or regulation, specified provisions of law relating to coverage of and reimbursement for health care services delivered through telemedicine to apply to the Maryland Medical Assistance Program and managed care organizations in a specified manner; authorizing the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene to allow coverage of and reimbursement for health care services delivered in a specified manner and subject to the limitations of the State budget; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0802
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2014
Legislative Date
1/16/2014
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2014
Legislative Date
1/17/2014
Action
Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2014
Legislative Date
2/24/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2014
Legislative Date
2/25/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {277574/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2014
Legislative Date
2/25/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2014
Legislative Date
2/27/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2014
Legislative Date
2/28/2014
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
38
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/05/2014
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2014
Legislative Date
3/20/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2014
Legislative Date
3/20/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2014
Legislative Date
3/21/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/20/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/14/2014
Legislative Date
4/14/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 141
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/15/2014 1/16/2014 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/17/2014 1/17/2014 Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/24/2014 2/24/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 2/25/2014 2/25/2014 Favorable with Amendments {277574/1 Report Adopted 33
Senate 2/25/2014 2/25/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 33
Senate 2/27/2014 2/27/2014 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 35
House 2/28/2014 2/28/2014 First Reading Health and Government Operations 38
House 3/05/2014 3/05/2014 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/24/2014 3/24/2014 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/25/2014 3/20/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 56
House 3/25/2014 3/20/2014 Second Reading Passed 56
House 3/26/2014 3/21/2014 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 57
Senate 3/27/2014 3/20/2014 Returned Passed 54
Post Passage 4/14/2014 4/14/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 141
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-105.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM