Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Transit and Transportation Service - Audio Recordings - Requirements and Limitations
Sponsored by
Senators Brochin, Muse, Pinsky, Pugh, Ready, and Zirkin
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the Maryland Transit Administration and a county or municipality to activate, under specified conditions, audio recording devices installed on transit service vehicles; providing that specified audio recording devices be capable of automatic activation in the event of an accident or other public safety incident requiring documentation; providing that a specified recording may be made available only for specified purposes; requiring specified annual reports to the Governor and the General Assembly; etc.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0800 Session: 2015 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/19/2016
Legislative Date
1/20/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2016
Legislative Date
1/20/2016
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2016
Legislative Date
1/22/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2016
Legislative Date
1/22/2016
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2016
Legislative Date
2/22/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2016
Legislative Date
2/23/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {908774/1
Proceedings
29
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2016
Legislative Date
2/23/2016
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Ferguson) Adopted
Proceedings
29
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2016
Legislative Date
2/24/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {908774/1
Proceedings
30
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2016
Legislative Date
2/24/2016
Action
Special Order until 2/25 (Senator Benson) Adopted
Proceedings
30
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2016
Legislative Date
2/25/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {908774/1
Proceedings
31
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2016
Legislative Date
2/25/2016
Action
Special Order until 3/1 (Senator Zirkin) Adopted
Proceedings
31
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/01/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {908774/1
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/01/2016
Action
Special Order until 3/2 (Senator Zirkin) Adopted
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2016
Legislative Date
3/02/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {908774/1
Proceedings
35
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2016
Legislative Date
3/02/2016
Action
Motion Withdrawn Committee Amendment (Senator Zirkin) Adopted
Proceedings
35
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2016
Legislative Date
3/02/2016
Action
Substitute Committee Amendment {518478/1 Adopted
Proceedings
35
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2016
Legislative Date
3/02/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Proceedings
35
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2016
Legislative Date
3/02/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
35
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/04/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
37
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/04/2016
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
38
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2016
Legislative Date
3/08/2016
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/19/2016 1/20/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/20/2016 1/20/2016 Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/22/2016 1/22/2016 Hearing cancelled
Senate 1/22/2016 1/22/2016 Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/19/2016 2/22/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/23/2016 2/23/2016 Favorable with Amendments {908774/1 29
Senate 2/23/2016 2/23/2016 Motion Laid Over (Senator Ferguson) Adopted 29
Senate 2/24/2016 2/24/2016 Favorable with Amendments {908774/1 30
Senate 2/24/2016 2/24/2016 Special Order until 2/25 (Senator Benson) Adopted 30
Senate 2/25/2016 2/25/2016 Favorable with Amendments {908774/1 31
Senate 2/25/2016 2/25/2016 Special Order until 3/1 (Senator Zirkin) Adopted 31
Senate 3/01/2016 3/01/2016 Favorable with Amendments {908774/1 34
Senate 3/01/2016 3/01/2016 Special Order until 3/2 (Senator Zirkin) Adopted 34
Senate 3/02/2016 3/02/2016 Favorable with Amendments {908774/1 35
Senate 3/02/2016 3/02/2016 Motion Withdrawn Committee Amendment (Senator Zirkin) Adopted 35
Senate 3/02/2016 3/02/2016 Substitute Committee Amendment {518478/1 Adopted 35
Senate 3/02/2016 3/02/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted 35
Senate 3/02/2016 3/02/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 35
Senate 3/04/2016 3/04/2016 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 37
House 3/04/2016 3/04/2016 First Reading Environment and Transportation 38
House 3/08/2016 3/08/2016 Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-101, 7-705.1, 7-802 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM