Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board for the Certification of Residential Child Care Program Professionals - Revisions
Sponsored by
Senator Conway
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 331
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the requirements for the designation and appointment of a program administrator of a residential child care program; requiring the chief administrator or other appropriate program authority to forward to the State Board for the Certification of Residential Child Care Program Professionals a specified criminal history records check of a specified individual at a specified time; requiring the Board to evaluate the moral character of an acting residential child care program administrator; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0742
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2015
Legislative Date
2/02/2015
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2015
Legislative Date
2/04/2015
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2015
Legislative Date
3/02/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/03/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {494734/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/03/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2015
Legislative Date
3/05/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/06/2015
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
38
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2015
Legislative Date
3/31/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2015
Legislative Date
3/28/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {166286/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2015
Legislative Date
3/28/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (138-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/30/2015
Action
Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/30/2015
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
House Refuses to Recede
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Delegates Hayes, Angel, and Morgan
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Senators Conway, Montgomery, and Bates
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
Conference Committee Report Adopted
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Conference Committee Report Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 331
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2015 2/02/2015 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/04/2015 2/04/2015 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/27/2015 3/02/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/03/2015 3/03/2015 Favorable with Amendments {494734/1 Report Adopted 34
Senate 3/03/2015 3/03/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 34
Senate 3/05/2015 3/05/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 36
House 3/06/2015 3/06/2015 First Reading Health and Government Operations 38
House 3/18/2015 3/18/2015 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/27/2015 3/31/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/01/2015 3/28/2015 Favorable with Amendments {166286/1 Report Adopted 58
House 4/01/2015 3/28/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 58
House 4/02/2015 3/29/2015 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (138-0) 59
Senate 4/06/2015 3/30/2015 Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments 57
Senate 4/06/2015 3/30/2015 Senate Requests House Recede 57
House 4/09/2015 4/03/2015 House Refuses to Recede 64
House 4/09/2015 4/03/2015 Conference Committee Appointed 64
House 4/09/2015 4/03/2015 Delegates Hayes, Angel, and Morgan 64
Senate 4/09/2015 4/02/2015 Conference Committee Appointed 60
Senate 4/09/2015 4/02/2015 Senators Conway, Montgomery, and Bates 60
House 4/11/2015 4/06/2015 Conference Committee Report Adopted 67
House 4/11/2015 4/06/2015 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 67
Senate 4/11/2015 4/04/2015 Conference Committee Report Adopted 62
Senate 4/11/2015 4/04/2015 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 62
Senate 4/11/2015 4/04/2015 Passed Enrolled 62
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 331
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   20-101, 20-301 through 20-304, 20-306, 20-307, 20-310, 20-311, 20-313 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM