Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Recordation and Transfer Taxes - Transfer of Property Between Related Entities - Exemption
Sponsored by
Senators King, Brinkley, Currie, Garagiola, Madaleno, Manno, Peters, Ramirez, Raskin, and Robey
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 452
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Exempting from the recordation tax and the State transfer tax the transfer of real property between a parent business entity and its wholly owned subsidiary or between subsidiaries wholly owned by the same parent business entity under specified circumstances; and applying the Act to instruments of writing recorded on or after July 1, 2013.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0372
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2013
Legislative Date
1/18/2013
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2013
Legislative Date
3/07/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2013
Legislative Date
3/07/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {579030/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2013
Legislative Date
3/07/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2013
Legislative Date
3/11/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2013
Legislative Date
3/12/2013
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {895969/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (132-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2013
Legislative Date
5/16/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 452
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/17/2013 1/18/2013 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/23/2013 1/23/2013 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/06/2013 3/07/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/07/2013 3/07/2013 Favorable with Amendments {579030/1 Report Adopted 40
Senate 3/07/2013 3/07/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40
Senate 3/11/2013 3/11/2013 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 42
House 3/12/2013 3/12/2013 First Reading Ways and Means 45
House 3/20/2013 3/20/2013 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/04/2013 4/05/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Favorable with Amendments {895969/1 Report Adopted 64
House 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 64
House 4/06/2013 4/01/2013 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (132-0) 65
Senate 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Senate Concur - House Amendments 65
Senate 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 65
Senate 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Passed Enrolled 65
Post Passage 5/16/2013 5/16/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 452
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-108, 13-207 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM