Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Consumer Protection - Credit Report Security Freezes - Notice and Fees
Sponsored by
Senators Lee, Ferguson, Guzzone, Kelley, King, Pinsky, Rosapepe, Smith, Zucker, Middleton, Astle, Benson, Feldman, Hershey, Jennings, Klausmeier, Mathias, and Reilly
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 677
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a consumer reporting agency from charging a fee for the placement of a security freeze requested by a consumer or a certain consumer representative; prohibiting a consumer reporting agency from charging a fee for the temporary lift or removal of a security freeze that has been placed on the consumer's credit report; and altering the contents of a certain notice that must be included with a certain summary of rights provided to a consumer.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Economic Matters
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0710
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2018
Legislative Date
1/17/2018
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Consumer Protection - Credit Report Security Freezes - Notice and Fees
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {177577/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Consumer Protection - Credit Report Security Freezes - Notice and Fees
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (101-37)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2018
Legislative Date
5/15/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 677
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/17/2018 1/17/2018 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Consumer Protection - Credit Report Security Freezes - Notice and Fees
Senate 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/13/2018 3/13/2018 Favorable with Amendments {177577/1 Adopted 45
Senate 3/13/2018 3/13/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45
Text - Third - Consumer Protection - Credit Report Security Freezes - Notice and Fees
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 47
House 3/15/2018 3/12/2018 Referred Economic Matters 46
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/28/2018 3/28/2018 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/28/2018 3/21/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 55
House 3/29/2018 3/22/2018 Third Reading Passed (101-37) 56
Senate 3/30/2018 3/27/2018 Returned Passed 58
Post Passage 5/15/2018 5/15/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 677
Text - Chapter - Consumer Protection - Credit Report Security Freezes - Notice and Fees
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-1212.1, 14-1212.2, 14-1212.3 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM