Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax Credit - Qualified Research and Development Expenses - Credit Amounts and Small Business Refund
Sponsored by
Senators King, Brinkley, Colburn, Currie, Garagiola, Klausmeier, Madaleno, Manno, McFadden, Peters, Pugh, Robey, and Young
Status
In the House - Rereferred to Ways and Means
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Defining "small business" as it relates to a refund in connection with a credit against the State income tax for research and development expenses incurred by an individual or corporation; altering to $4,000,000 the maximum amount of research and development credits that the Department of Business and Economic Development may approve in a calendar year; providing that specified unused credits may be claimed as a refund; and applying the Act to Maryland research and development tax credits certified after December 15, 2012.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0386
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0570 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2013
Legislative Date
1/18/2013
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2013
Legislative Date
1/31/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2013
Legislative Date
1/31/2013
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {559134/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/08/2013
Action
Rereferred to Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/17/2013 1/18/2013 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/23/2013 1/23/2013 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/31/2013 1/31/2013 Hearing cancelled
Senate 1/31/2013 1/31/2013 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/05/2013 4/05/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/05/2013 4/01/2013 Favorable with Amendments {559134/1 Report Adopted 63
Senate 4/05/2013 4/01/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 63
Senate 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 64
House 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 66
House 4/08/2013 4/08/2013 Rereferred to Ways and Means
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-721 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM