Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
PenMar Development Corporation - Dissolution - Authority of Washington County Over Fort Ritchie
Sponsored by
Washington County Senators
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 142
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing specified provisions of law relating to the PenMar Development Corporation, its board of directors, and its powers to develop, manage, and control Fort Ritchie; transferring specified remaining real and personal property interests, along with specified contracts, leases, and liabilities from the Corporation to the Board of County Commissioners for Washington County; requiring any party that has an issue with the transfer from the Corporation to the Board to refer to the specified memorandum of understanding; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Economic Matters
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: HB0605
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/19/2017
Legislative Date
1/19/2017
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/19/2017
Legislative Date
1/19/2017
Action
Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2017
Legislative Date
2/02/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
16
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2017
Legislative Date
2/02/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
16
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
17A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2017
Legislative Date
2/07/2017
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
20
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-1)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2017
Legislative Date
3/25/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/11/2017
Legislative Date
4/11/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 142
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/19/2017 1/19/2017 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/19/2017 1/19/2017 Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - PenMar Development Corporation - Dissolution - Authority of Washington County Over Fort Ritchie
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 2/02/2017 2/02/2017 Favorable Adopted 16
Senate 2/02/2017 2/02/2017 Second Reading Passed 16
Text - Third - PenMar Development Corporation - Dissolution - Authority of Washington County Over Fort Ritchie
Senate 2/06/2017 2/03/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 17A
House 2/07/2017 2/07/2017 Referred Economic Matters 20
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/27/2017 3/27/2017 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/27/2017 3/22/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 56
House 3/28/2017 3/23/2017 Third Reading Passed (137-1) 57
Senate 3/29/2017 3/25/2017 Returned Passed 54
Post Passage 4/11/2017 4/11/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 142
Text - Chapter - PenMar Development Corporation - Dissolution - Authority of Washington County Over Fort Ritchie
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-301, 11-501 through 11-520 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM