Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Higher Education - Cybersecurity Public Service Scholarship Program
Sponsored by
Senators Simonaire and Lee
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 415
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Cybersecurity Public Service Scholarship Program to support students who are pursuing an education in programs that are directly relevant to cybersecurity; requiring the Office of Student Financial Assistance to administer the Program; specifying certain eligibility requirements for an applicant to the Program; authorizing a certain scholarship award to be used at any eligible institution to pay for certain education expenses; requiring a scholarship recipient to maintain a certain grade point average; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/18/2018
Legislative Date
1/18/2018
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/18/2018
Legislative Date
1/18/2018
Action
Hearing 1/31 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Higher Education - Cybersecurity Public Service Scholarship Program
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {574437/1
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Committee Amendment (#1) Adopted (29-14)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Committee Amendment (#2-3) Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Higher Education - Cybersecurity Public Service Scholarship Program
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
48C
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/06/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
70
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2018
Legislative Date
5/08/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 415
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Higher Education - Cybersecurity Public Service Scholarship Program
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/18/2018 1/18/2018 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/18/2018 1/18/2018 Hearing 1/31 at 2:00 p.m.
Text - First - Higher Education - Cybersecurity Public Service Scholarship Program
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Favorable with Amendments {574437/1 47
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Committee Amendment (#1) Adopted (29-14) 47
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Committee Amendment (#2-3) Adopted 47
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
Text - Third - Higher Education - Cybersecurity Public Service Scholarship Program
Senate 3/19/2018 3/17/2018 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 48C
House 3/20/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Ways and Means 50
House 3/20/2018 3/20/2018 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 4/06/2018 4/06/2018 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 4/07/2018 3/30/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 64
House 4/09/2018 4/05/2018 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 70
Post Passage 5/08/2018 5/08/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 415
Text - Chapter - Higher Education - Cybersecurity Public Service Scholarship Program
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   18-3401 through 18-3406 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM