Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Speed Monitoring and Work Zone Speed Control Systems
Sponsored by
Senators Brochin, Klausmeier, Muse, Peters, and Zirkin
Status
In the Senate - Special Order until 11:30 (Senator Pipkin) Adopted
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring that specified time-stamped images of a motor vehicle taken by a speed monitoring or speed control system provide sufficient information to show the progression of the motor vehicle; limiting the placement of speed monitoring systems in school zones; requiring a calibration check to be performed quarterly rather than annually; altering specified prohibitions relating to the fee of a contractor that administers and processes specified civil citations; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2013
Legislative Date
1/18/2013
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2013
Legislative Date
3/17/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {578570/1
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2013
Legislative Date
3/17/2013
Action
Laid Over (Senator Pipkin) Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {578570/1
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
Special Order until 3/21 (Senator Madaleno) Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {578570/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Madaleno) {773821/1 Adopted
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Glassman) {873724/1 Rejected (11-35)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Pipkin) {733629/2 Adopted
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-1)
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2013
Legislative Date
3/22/2013
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
55A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2013
Legislative Date
3/26/2013
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {490412/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Special Order until later today (Delegate Malone) Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Special Order until next session (Delegate Malone) Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
Floor Committee Amendment {400714/1 Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (106-29)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Senators Raskin, Brochin, and Shank
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
House Refuses to Recede
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Delegates Malone, Stein, and McMillan
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/06/2013
Action
Special Order until 11:30 (Senator Pipkin) Adopted
Proceedings
68
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/17/2013 1/18/2013 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/15/2013 3/18/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/19/2013 3/17/2013 Favorable with Amendments {578570/1 48
Senate 3/19/2013 3/17/2013 Laid Over (Senator Pipkin) Adopted 48
Senate 3/20/2013 3/18/2013 Favorable with Amendments {578570/1 49
Senate 3/20/2013 3/18/2013 Special Order until 3/21 (Senator Madaleno) Adopted 49
Senate 3/22/2013 3/20/2013 Favorable with Amendments {578570/1 Report Adopted 51
Senate 3/22/2013 3/20/2013 Floor Amendment (Senator Madaleno) {773821/1 Adopted 51
Senate 3/22/2013 3/20/2013 Floor Amendment (Senator Glassman) {873724/1 Rejected (11-35) 51
Senate 3/22/2013 3/20/2013 Floor Amendment (Senator Pipkin) {733629/2 Adopted 51
Senate 3/22/2013 3/20/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 51
Senate 3/25/2013 3/21/2013 Third Reading Passed (46-1) 52
House 3/26/2013 3/22/2013 First Reading Environmental Matters 55A
House 3/26/2013 3/26/2013 Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/04/2013 4/04/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
House 4/04/2013 3/29/2013 Favorable with Amendments {490412/1 Report Adopted 62
House 4/04/2013 3/29/2013 Special Order until later today (Delegate Malone) Adopted 62
House 4/04/2013 3/29/2013 Special Order until next session (Delegate Malone) Adopted 62
House 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Floor Committee Amendment {400714/1 Adopted 63
House 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 63
House 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (106-29) 64
Senate 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments 64
Senate 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 Senate Requests House Recede 64
Senate 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 Conference Committee Appointed 64
Senate 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 Senators Raskin, Brochin, and Shank 64
House 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 House Refuses to Recede 67
House 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Conference Committee Appointed 67
House 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Delegates Malone, Stein, and McMillan 67
Senate 4/08/2013 4/06/2013 Special Order until 11:30 (Senator Pipkin) Adopted 68
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   21-809, 21-810 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM