Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Condominiums - Warranty Claims
Sponsored by
Senator Kelley
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing that, notwithstanding any provision in the declaration, bylaws, or rules and regulations of the condominium, a council of unit owners has the right to be involved in a specified manner in specified litigation or administrative proceedings affecting the condominium and to enforce implied warranties made to the council of unit owners by the developer; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0259
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1141 Session: 2013 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2014
Legislative Date
1/16/2014
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2014
Legislative Date
1/15/2014
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2014
Legislative Date
2/17/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2014
Legislative Date
2/17/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
27
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2014
Legislative Date
2/17/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
27
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2014
Legislative Date
2/19/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (36-11)
Proceedings
29
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2014
Legislative Date
2/20/2014
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
32
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/05/2014
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
4/04/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/15/2014 1/16/2014 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/15/2014 1/15/2014 Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/14/2014 2/17/2014 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/17/2014 2/17/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 27
Senate 2/17/2014 2/17/2014 Second Reading Passed 27
Senate 2/19/2014 2/19/2014 Third Reading Passed (36-11) 29
House 2/20/2014 2/20/2014 First Reading Environmental Matters 32
House 3/05/2014 3/05/2014 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/03/2014 4/04/2014 Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-109, 11-134.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM