Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Child Abuse - Failure to Report - Penalties and Task Force
Sponsored by
Senators Kelley, Colburn, Currie, DeGrange, Feldman, Forehand, Kittleman, Klausmeier, Mathias, Stone, and Young
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Making it a misdemeanor, subject to specified penalties, for a specified person to knowingly and willfully fail to report child abuse under specified circumstances; establishing the Task Force to Study Training for Mandatory Reporters on the Risk Factors, Prevention, Identification, and Reporting of Child Abuse; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Task Force; prohibiting a member of the Task Force from receiving specified compensation, but authorizing the reimbursement of specified expenses; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1053
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014, June 1, 2014
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2014
Legislative Date
1/16/2014
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2014
Legislative Date
1/17/2014
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/15/2014 1/16/2014 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/17/2014 1/17/2014 Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/08/2014 3/10/2014 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
(   3-602.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page