Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Institutions of Postsecondary Education - Personal Electronic Account - Privacy Protection
Sponsored by
Senators Young, Conway, Hough, Montgomery, Nathan-Pulliam, and Waugh
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 466
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting an institution of postsecondary education from requiring, requesting, suggesting, or causing a student, an applicant, or a prospective student to grant access to, allow observation of, or disclose information that allows access to or observation of the individual's personal electronic account; prohibiting an institution of postsecondary education from compelling, as a condition of acceptance or participation in specified activities, an individual to add individuals to a contact list or to change privacy settings; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0934
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0030 Session: 2014 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2015
Legislative Date
2/02/2015
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2015
Legislative Date
2/04/2015
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2015
Legislative Date
2/26/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2015
Legislative Date
2/27/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {954731/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2015
Legislative Date
2/27/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/03/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
34
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2015
Legislative Date
3/04/2015
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2015
Legislative Date
3/11/2015
Action
Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/30/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {744366/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/30/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (132-7)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 466
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2015 2/02/2015 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/04/2015 2/04/2015 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/25/2015 2/26/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/27/2015 2/27/2015 Favorable with Amendments {954731/1 Report Adopted 32
Senate 2/27/2015 2/27/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 32
Senate 3/03/2015 3/03/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 34
House 3/04/2015 3/04/2015 First Reading Appropriations 36
House 3/11/2015 3/11/2015 Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/02/2015 4/03/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 4/03/2015 3/30/2015 Favorable with Amendments {744366/1 Report Adopted 60
House 4/03/2015 3/30/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 60
House 4/08/2015 4/02/2015 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (132-7) 63
Senate 4/11/2015 4/04/2015 Senate Concur - House Amendments 62
Senate 4/11/2015 4/04/2015 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 62
Senate 4/11/2015 4/04/2015 Passed Enrolled 62
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 466
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   26-401 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM