Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Class 8 Farm Brewery License Holders - Food Service
Sponsored by
Senators Zucker, Bates, Hough, Mathias, Norman, Peters, Ready, and Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 467
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the restriction on a holder of a Class 8 farm brewery license selling or serving only specified types of food; and allowing the holder to sell and serve any food if the holder is licensed to operate a food establishment, subject to specified requirements.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0071
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/19/2017
Legislative Date
1/19/2017
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {994234/1 Adopted
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2017
Legislative Date
3/09/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {903290/1 Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/04/2017
Legislative Date
5/04/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 467
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/19/2017 1/19/2017 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Alcoholic Beverages - Class 8 Farm Brewery License Holders - Food Service
Senate 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Favorable with Amendments {994234/1 Adopted 38
Senate 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 38
Text - Third - Alcoholic Beverages - Class 8 Farm Brewery License Holders - Food Service
Senate 3/09/2017 3/09/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 40
House 3/10/2017 3/10/2017 Referred Economic Matters 43
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 4/05/2017 4/05/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 4/05/2017 3/29/2017 Favorable with Amendments {903290/1 Adopted 63
House 4/05/2017 3/29/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 63
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 64
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Senate Concurs House Amendments 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Alcoholic Beverages - Class 8 Farm Brewery License Holders - Food Service
Post Passage 5/04/2017 5/04/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 467
Text - Chapter - Alcoholic Beverages - Class 8 Farm Brewery License Holders - Food Service
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/19/2020 9:34 AM