Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Natural Resources - Tree Experts - Prohibition
Sponsored by
Senator Shank
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a licensed tree expert from supervising more than one company that provides tree expert services.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0728
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2013
Legislative Date
1/18/2013
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/11/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2013
Legislative Date
2/12/2013
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
23
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2013
Legislative Date
2/12/2013
Action
Special Order until 2/13 (Senator Middleton) Adopted
Proceedings
23
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
24
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
24
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2013
Legislative Date
2/15/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
26
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2013
Legislative Date
2/18/2013
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
29
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2013
Legislative Date
3/08/2013
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/17/2013 1/18/2013 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/23/2013 1/23/2013 Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/08/2013 2/11/2013 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/12/2013 2/12/2013 Favorable 23
Senate 2/12/2013 2/12/2013 Special Order until 2/13 (Senator Middleton) Adopted 23
Senate 2/13/2013 2/13/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 24
Senate 2/13/2013 2/13/2013 Second Reading Passed 24
Senate 2/15/2013 2/15/2013 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 26
House 2/18/2013 2/18/2013 First Reading Environmental Matters 29
House 3/08/2013 3/08/2013 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/02/2013 4/03/2013 Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM