Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Misdemeanor Convictions
Sponsored by
Senator Gladden
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a person to file a petition for expungement of a police or court record if the person was convicted of a specified misdemeanor and was under 35 years of age at the time of the conviction; and specifying the time period within which a petition for expungement based on a conviction of a misdemeanor may not be filed.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0195
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2014
Legislative Date
1/16/2014
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2014
Legislative Date
1/17/2014
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/15/2014 1/16/2014 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/17/2014 1/17/2014 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM