Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Military Retirement Income
Sponsored by
Senators Salling, Bailey, Carozza, Cassilly, Eckardt, Edwards, Ellis, Gallion, Hershey, Hough, Jennings, King, Klausmeier, Peters, Ready, Reilly, Serafini, Simonaire, Smith, West, and Young
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the maximum amount of a subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax for certain military retirement income for certain taxable years; removing a certain limitation on the subtraction modification for taxable years beginning after December 31, 2022; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0294 Session: 2019 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/16/2020
Legislative Date
1/16/2020
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Military Retirement Income
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2020
Legislative Date
1/17/2020
Action
Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/16/2020 1/16/2020 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Military Retirement Income
Senate 1/17/2020 1/17/2020 Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/27/2020 2:24 PM