Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Budget - Mandated Appropriations - Reductions
Sponsored by
Senators Waugh, Bates, Edwards, Hough, Norman, Reilly, Salling, and Serafini
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a certain report of the Board of Revenue Estimates to include year-over-year estimates of General Fund revenue growth for certain fiscal years; authorizing the Governor, if the estimated year-over-year General Fund revenue growth for the following fiscal year is less than 3%, to reduce an appropriation that is required to be included in the budget bill for the next fiscal year by up to 1% of the mandated amount; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1339
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/18/2018
Legislative Date
1/18/2018
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Budget - Mandated Appropriations - Reductions
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/19/2018
Legislative Date
1/19/2018
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/18/2018 1/18/2018 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - State Budget - Mandated Appropriations - Reductions
Senate 1/19/2018 1/19/2018 Hearing 1/30 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM