Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Fines for Texting Offenses - Use for Educational Programs
Sponsored by
Senator Jennings
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Comptroller to distribute 25% of the revenue from fines collected for violations of a specified prohibition on using a text messaging device while driving, up to a maximum of $250,000 for each fiscal year, to the R Adams Cowley Shock Trauma Center at the University of Maryland Medical System to be used by the Center for Injury Prevention and Policy for educational programs addressing the dangers of distracted driving.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2014
Legislative Date
1/16/2014
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2014
Legislative Date
1/17/2014
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/15/2014 1/16/2014 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/17/2014 1/17/2014 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-118 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM