Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Handgun Permit - Temporary Training Waiver
Sponsored by
Senators Norman, Bates, Cassilly, Eckardt, Edwards, Hershey, Hough, Jennings, Klausmeier, Ready, Reilly, Salling, Serafini, and Waugh
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Secretary of State Police, on making a determination that an applicant has demonstrated evidence of imminent danger to the applicant, to temporarily waive a specified requirement to complete a specified firearms training course; and requiring a specified permit to require completion of a specified course within 60 days after the issuance of the permit.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0769
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0781 Session: 2015 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2016
Legislative Date
1/21/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/20/2016 1/21/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM