Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Task Force to Study the Need for Enhanced Monitoring of Guardians of Vulnerable Adults
Sponsored by
Senators Kelley, Benson, Brochin, Conway, Currie, Guzzone, Kasemeyer, Klausmeier, Lee, Mathias, McFadden, Middleton, Nathan-Pulliam, Oaks, Pinsky, Ramirez, Rosapepe, Smith, and Young
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Establishing the Task Force to Study the Need for Enhanced Monitoring of Guardians of Vulnerable Adults; providing for the composition, cochairs, and staffing of the Task Force; requiring the Task Force to study and make recommendations regarding certain matters related to the monitoring of guardians of vulnerable adults; requiring the Task Force to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 15, 2018; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/18/2018
Legislative Date
1/18/2018
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/18/2018
Legislative Date
1/18/2018
Action
Hearing 1/31 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2018
Legislative Date
1/25/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/18/2018 1/18/2018 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/18/2018 1/18/2018 Hearing 1/31 at 2:00 p.m.
Text - First - Task Force to Study the Need for Enhanced Monitoring of Guardians of Vulnerable Adults
Senate 1/25/2018 1/25/2018 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM