Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Workers' Compensation - Payment for Physician-Dispensed Prescriptions - Limitations
Sponsored by
Senator Klausmeier
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting employers or their insurers, except under specified circumstances, from being required to pay for prescriptions that are dispensed by physicians to covered employees who have suffered accidental personal injuries, compensable hernias, or occupational diseases.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0280
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2014
Legislative Date
1/16/2014
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/15/2014 1/16/2014 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/29/2014 1/29/2014 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-660, 9-660.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM