Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Department of Health - Birth Registration - Gestational Carriers
Sponsored by
Senator Kelley
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring a certain person to attach a copy of an order of the court establishing parentage to a certificate of birth under certain circumstances; requiring, for a birth involving a gestational carrier in which parentage is determined by a certain court, that a certain person enter certain information on the forms provided by the Secretary of Health and attach a certain order to the forms; requiring the Division of Vital Records to immediately take certain actions on receipt of certain documents; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB1062 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/30/2020
Legislative Date
10/30/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/23/2020
Legislative Date
12/23/2020
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/30/2020 10/30/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Finance
Senate 12/23/2020 12/23/2020 Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Maryland Department of Health - Birth Registration - Gestational Carriers
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/12/2021 12:21 PM