Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Workers' Compensation - Workers' Compensation Commission - Issuance of Subpoenas
Sponsored by
Senators Klausmeier, Middleton, Kittleman, Glassman, Kelley, Mathias, Pugh, and Ramirez
Status
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Workers' Compensation Commission, on a request of a party to a proceeding pending before the Commission, to issue a subpoena for specified purposes; authorizing the Commission to assess the whole cost of the proceeding against the requesting party if the Commission determines after an evidentiary hearing that the subpoena was requested in bad faith; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0219
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2014
Legislative Date
1/16/2014
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2014
Legislative Date
2/28/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/03/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {407970/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/03/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/05/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
39
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/05/2014
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/23/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/23/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/23/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2014
Legislative Date
5/15/2014
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/15/2014 1/16/2014 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/29/2014 1/29/2014 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/27/2014 2/28/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/03/2014 3/03/2014 Favorable with Amendments {407970/1 Report Adopted 37
Senate 3/03/2014 3/03/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 37
Senate 3/05/2014 3/05/2014 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 39
House 3/05/2014 3/05/2014 First Reading Economic Matters 41
House 3/27/2014 3/28/2014 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/28/2014 3/23/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 59
House 3/28/2014 3/23/2014 Second Reading Passed 59
House 3/31/2014 3/24/2014 Third Reading Passed (132-0) 60
Senate 4/01/2014 3/23/2014 Returned Passed 57
Post Passage 5/15/2014 5/15/2014 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM