Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Registration Plates for Individuals with Disabilities - Parking in Baltimore County
Sponsored by
Senator Klausmeier (By Request - Baltimore County Administration)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 32
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing an individual for whom special registration plates for individuals with disabilities are issued to park in a designated zone for the handicapped established by Baltimore County on any county road, subject to a restriction.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0320
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0347 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/18/2013
Legislative Date
1/18/2013
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2013
Legislative Date
2/18/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2013
Legislative Date
2/19/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
28
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2013
Legislative Date
2/19/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
28
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2013
Legislative Date
2/21/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2013
Legislative Date
2/22/2013
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
33
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2013
Legislative Date
3/08/2013
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/26/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/26/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-2)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/09/2013
Legislative Date
4/09/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 32
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/18/2013 1/18/2013 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/23/2013 1/23/2013 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/15/2013 2/18/2013 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/19/2013 2/19/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 28
Senate 2/19/2013 2/19/2013 Second Reading Passed 28
Senate 2/21/2013 2/21/2013 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 30
House 2/22/2013 2/22/2013 First Reading Environmental Matters 33
House 3/08/2013 3/08/2013 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/29/2013 4/01/2013 Favorable Report by Environmental Matters
House 4/01/2013 3/26/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 59
House 4/01/2013 3/26/2013 Second Reading Passed 59
House 4/04/2013 3/29/2013 Third Reading Passed (135-2) 62
Senate 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Returned Passed 61A
Post Passage 4/09/2013 4/09/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 32
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-616 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM