Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Physicians - Distribution of Fees by Comptroller - Loan Assistance Repayment for Physicians and Physician Assistants
Sponsored by
Senator Conway
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 178
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the circumstances under which the Comptroller is required to distribute fees received from the State Board of Physicians to the Office of Student Financial Assistance to be used to make grants under the Maryland Loan Assistance Repayment Program for Physicians and Physician Assistants in fiscal years 2017 and 2018; repealing specified provisions of law that require the Comptroller to distribute specified fees to the Health Personnel Shortage Incentive Grant Program under specified circumstances etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2016
Legislative Date
1/21/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2016
Legislative Date
1/21/2016
Action
Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2016
Legislative Date
2/01/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2016
Legislative Date
2/01/2016
Action
Hearing 2/03 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/15/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2016
Legislative Date
2/16/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {864939/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
24
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2016
Legislative Date
2/16/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
24
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2016
Legislative Date
2/18/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
26
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2016
Legislative Date
2/19/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
28
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2016
Legislative Date
2/24/2016
Action
Reassigned to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
31
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2016
Legislative Date
3/09/2016
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {196182/2 Report Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (137-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/26/2016
Legislative Date
4/26/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 178
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/20/2016 1/21/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/21/2016 1/21/2016 Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/01/2016 2/01/2016 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/01/2016 2/01/2016 Hearing 2/03 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 2/12/2016 2/15/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/16/2016 2/16/2016 Favorable with Amendments {864939/1 Report Adopted 24
Senate 2/16/2016 2/16/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 24
Senate 2/18/2016 2/18/2016 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 26
House 2/19/2016 2/19/2016 First Reading Ways and Means 28
House 2/24/2016 2/24/2016 Reassigned to Health and Government Operations 31
House 3/09/2016 3/09/2016 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/01/2016 4/05/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/05/2016 3/29/2016 Favorable with Amendments {196182/2 Report Adopted 61
House 4/05/2016 3/29/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61
House 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (137-0) 64
Senate 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Senate Concur - House Amendments 63
Senate 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 63
Senate 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Passed Enrolled 63
Post Passage 4/26/2016 4/26/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 178
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-207, 15-206 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM