Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Utilities - Water Companies and Sewage Disposal Companies - Rate Cases and Proceedings
Sponsored by
Senators Middleton, Hershey, Astle, Benson, Feldman, Jennings, Klausmeier, Mathias, Reilly, and Rosapepe
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 536
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the technical staff of the Public Service Commission to assist a water company or a sewage disposal company in establishing a proposed just and reasonable rate; authorizing the technical staff to seek information from specified companies under specified circumstances; requiring the Commission to restrict the availability of specified staff-assisted rate cases to companies who gross annual revenues for a specified time period are below an amount determined by the Commission, not to exceed $1,000,000; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0511
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/19/2017
Legislative Date
1/19/2017
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/19/2017
Legislative Date
1/19/2017
Action
Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2017
Legislative Date
2/02/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {137474/1 Adopted
Proceedings
16 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2017
Legislative Date
2/02/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
16 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
17AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2017
Legislative Date
2/07/2017
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
20 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2017
Legislative Date
3/25/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/04/2017
Legislative Date
5/04/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 536
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/19/2017 1/19/2017 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/19/2017 1/19/2017 Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Public Utilities - Water Companies and Sewage Disposal Companies - Rate Cases and Proceedings
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 2/02/2017 2/02/2017 Favorable with Amendments {137474/1 Adopted 16 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/02/2017 2/02/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 16 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Public Utilities - Water Companies and Sewage Disposal Companies - Rate Cases and Proceedings
Senate 2/06/2017 2/03/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 17AClick to view Recorded Media
House 2/07/2017 2/07/2017 Referred Economic Matters 20 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/27/2017 3/27/2017 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/27/2017 3/22/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/28/2017 3/23/2017 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2017 3/25/2017 Returned Passed 54 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/04/2017 5/04/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 536
Text - Chapter - Public Utilities - Water Companies and Sewage Disposal Companies - Rate Cases and Proceedings
(   4-203, 4-207 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM
Click to return on the top page