Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Home- and Community-Based Services Waiver - Modification
Sponsored by
Senators Kelley and Currie
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Altering specified financial eligibility criteria included in the home- and community-based services waiver; requiring, on or before October 1, 2015, the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene to apply to the Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services for an amendment to a specified waiver to cease providing specified services to specified individuals and to allow specified individuals to qualify for specified services by establishing a specified qualified income trust; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
Contingency - on federal, state, or local action
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2015
Legislative Date
2/02/2015
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2015
Legislative Date
2/03/2015
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2015
Legislative Date
2/05/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2015 2/02/2015 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/03/2015 2/03/2015 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/05/2015 2/05/2015 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/05/2015 2/06/2015 Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM