Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Police Training Commission - Training Requirements - Human Trafficking
Sponsored by
Senators Lee, Feldman, Kelley, King, Manno, and Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 645
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Police Training Commission to require that the specified entrance-level and in-service police training conducted by the State and each county and municipal police training school include specified training relating to the criminal laws concerning human trafficking, including services and support available to victims and the rights and appropriate treatment of victims; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1279
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0292 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/19/2017
Legislative Date
1/19/2017
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/19/2017
Legislative Date
1/19/2017
Action
Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Police Training Commission - Training Requirements - Human Trafficking
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2017
Legislative Date
2/20/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2017
Legislative Date
2/21/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {188878/1 Adopted
Proceedings
28
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2017
Legislative Date
2/21/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
28
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Police Training Commission - Training Requirements - Human Trafficking
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2017
Legislative Date
2/23/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2017
Legislative Date
2/24/2017
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
33
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/07/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2017
Legislative Date
5/25/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 645
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/19/2017 1/19/2017 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/19/2017 1/19/2017 Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Police Training Commission - Training Requirements - Human Trafficking
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/20/2017 2/20/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/21/2017 2/21/2017 Favorable with Amendments {188878/1 Adopted 28
Senate 2/21/2017 2/21/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 28
Text - Third - Police Training Commission - Training Requirements - Human Trafficking
Senate 2/23/2017 2/23/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 30
House 2/24/2017 2/24/2017 Referred Judiciary 33
House 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 4/07/2017 4/07/2017 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 4/07/2017 3/31/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 65
House 4/10/2017 4/04/2017 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 69
Post Passage 5/25/2017 5/25/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 645
Text - Chapter - Police Training Commission - Training Requirements - Human Trafficking
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM