Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Arena License
Sponsored by
Senators Young and Hough
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 93
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing in Frederick County a Class B-A (arena) beer and wine license; specifying that the license authorizes the license holder to sell beer and wine by the drink on the campus of an institution of higher education from one or more outlets that the Board of License Commissioners approves and for on-premises consumption at sporting and nonsporting events held at the institution; and requiring the Board to adopt certain regulations.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0506
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/18/2018
Legislative Date
1/18/2018
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/18/2018
Legislative Date
1/18/2018
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Arena License
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2018
Legislative Date
3/09/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Arena License
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/09/2018
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
43A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/10/2018
Legislative Date
4/10/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 93
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Arena License
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/18/2018 1/18/2018 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/18/2018 1/18/2018 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Arena License
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Favorable Adopted 41
Senate 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Second Reading Passed 41
Senate 3/09/2018 3/09/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 43
Text - Third - Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Arena License
House 3/12/2018 3/09/2018 Referred Economic Matters 43A
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/28/2018 3/28/2018 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/28/2018 3/21/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 55
House 3/29/2018 3/22/2018 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 56
Senate 3/30/2018 3/27/2018 Returned Passed 58
Post Passage 4/10/2018 4/10/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 93
Text - Chapter - Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Arena License
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   20-1001, 20-1001.1, 20-1001.2, 20-102 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM