Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Hate Crimes - Protected Groups and Penalties
Sponsored by
Senator Hettleman
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/20 at 11:00 a.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the term "sexual orientation" in the context of hate crimes to include gender expression; including age in the list of characteristics protected by the prohibition on hate crimes; authorizing a court to require an offender convicted of hate crimes to complete an antibias education program; requiring a court to provide offenders convicted of hate crimes with information on an antibias education program; requiring the University System of Maryland to develop and offer an antibias education program; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0128
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0485 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/29/2020
Legislative Date
10/29/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/28/2020
Legislative Date
12/28/2020
Action
Hearing 1/20 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Criminal Law - Hate Crimes - Protected Groups and Penalties
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/29/2020 10/29/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 12/28/2020 12/28/2020 Hearing 1/20 at 11:00 a.m.
Text - First - Criminal Law - Hate Crimes - Protected Groups and Penalties
Age
(   12-120 )
Last Updated: 1/22/2021 9:51 AM
Click to return on the top page