Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Adult Entertainment Establishments - National Human Trafficking Resource Center Hotline Information - Sign Posting Requirements
Sponsored by
Senators Lee, Feldman, Kelley, King, Manno, and Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 646
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the owner of an adult entertainment establishment to post the National Human Trafficking Resource Center Hotline information sign in each restroom of the adult entertainment establishment in a specified manner; requiring an agency that determines a specified violation has occurred to notify the owner of the adult entertainment establishment or the owner's agent of the violation; providing a maximum civil penalty of $1,000 for each restroom without the specified notification; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0258
Introduced in a prior session as: SB1084 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/19/2017
Legislative Date
1/19/2017
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/19/2017
Legislative Date
1/19/2017
Action
Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2017
Legislative Date
2/20/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2017
Legislative Date
2/21/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {638779/1 Adopted
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2017
Legislative Date
2/21/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2017
Legislative Date
2/23/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-2)
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2017
Legislative Date
2/24/2017
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {303593/1 Adopted
Proceedings
61AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Ready, Smith and Muse)
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Ready, Smith and Muse)
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
House Refuses Recede
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Frick, Fisher and Lisanti)
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
House Refuses Recede
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Frick, Fisher and Lisanti)
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Conference Committee Report {323723/1 Adopted
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Conference Committee Report {323723/1 Adopted
Proceedings
70 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (118-0)
Proceedings
70 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2017
Legislative Date
5/25/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 646
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/19/2017 1/19/2017 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/19/2017 1/19/2017 Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Adult Entertainment Establishments - National Human Trafficking Resource Center Hotline Information - Sign Posting Requirements
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/20/2017 2/20/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/21/2017 2/21/2017 Favorable with Amendments {638779/1 Adopted 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/21/2017 2/21/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Adult Entertainment Establishments - National Human Trafficking Resource Center Hotline Information - Sign Posting Requirements
Senate 2/23/2017 2/23/2017 Third Reading Passed (45-2) 30 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/24/2017 2/24/2017 Referred Economic Matters 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2017 4/03/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 4/03/2017 3/27/2017 Favorable with Amendments {303593/1 Adopted 61AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2017 3/27/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2017 3/28/2017 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2017 3/31/2017 Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2017 3/31/2017 Senate Requests House Recede 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2017 3/31/2017 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Ready, Smith and Muse) 60 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2017 3/31/2017 Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments 65 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2017 3/31/2017 Senate Requests House Recede 65 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2017 3/31/2017 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Ready, Smith and Muse) 65 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2017 3/31/2017 House Refuses Recede 65 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2017 3/31/2017 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Frick, Fisher and Lisanti) 65 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2017 4/01/2017 House Refuses Recede 61 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2017 4/01/2017 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Frick, Fisher and Lisanti) 61 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/04/2017 Conference Committee Report {323723/1 Adopted 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/04/2017 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 64 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2017 4/05/2017 Conference Committee Report {323723/1 Adopted 70 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2017 4/05/2017 Third Reading Passed (118-0) 70 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/04/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Adult Entertainment Establishments - National Human Trafficking Resource Center Hotline Information - Sign Posting Requirements
Post Passage 5/25/2017 5/25/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 646
Text - Chapter - Adult Entertainment Establishments - National Human Trafficking Resource Center Hotline Information - Sign Posting Requirements
(   15-207, 19-103 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM
Click to return on the top page