Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Law – State Administrator of Elections – Term
Sponsored by
Senator Simonaire
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing a 12-year term of office for the State Administrator of Elections; providing that the State Administrator is eligible for reappointment; requiring that, at the end of a term, the State Administrator continue to serve until a successor is appointed by the State Board, with the advice and consent of the Senate of Maryland; requiring that the first term of the State Administrator appointed in accordance with a certain provision of the Act begin on January 1, 2019; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/18/2018
Legislative Date
1/18/2018
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Election Law – State Administrator of Elections – Term
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/19/2018
Legislative Date
1/19/2018
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/18/2018 1/18/2018 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Election Law – State Administrator of Elections – Term
Senate 1/19/2018 1/19/2018 Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
(   2-103 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM
Click to return on the top page