Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Crimes - Threat of Mass Violence
Sponsored by
Senator Muse
Status
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from threatening to commit, or threatening to cause to be committed, a crime of violence that would place five or more people at substantial risk of death or serious physical injury if there is a specified result of the threat; establishing that a person who violates the Act is guilty of the misdemeanor of making a threat of mass violence; requiring a court to order a person convicted under the Act to reimburse specified persons; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0988 Session: 2013 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2014
Legislative Date
1/16/2014
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2014
Legislative Date
1/17/2014
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2014
Legislative Date
2/24/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2014
Legislative Date
2/25/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {328477/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2014
Legislative Date
2/25/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2014
Legislative Date
2/27/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2014
Legislative Date
2/28/2014
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
38
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2014
Legislative Date
3/19/2014
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
4/02/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {302714/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (138-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendment
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2014
Legislative Date
5/15/2014
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/15/2014 1/16/2014 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/17/2014 1/17/2014 Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/21/2014 2/24/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/25/2014 2/25/2014 Favorable with Amendments {328477/1 Report Adopted 33
Senate 2/25/2014 2/25/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 33
Senate 2/27/2014 2/27/2014 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 35
House 2/28/2014 2/28/2014 First Reading Judiciary 38
House 3/19/2014 3/19/2014 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/01/2014 4/02/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 4/02/2014 3/26/2014 Favorable with Amendments {302714/1 Report Adopted 62
House 4/02/2014 3/26/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62
House 4/03/2014 3/27/2014 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (138-0) 63
Senate 4/04/2014 3/26/2014 Senate Concur - House Amendment 60
Senate 4/04/2014 3/26/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 60
Senate 4/04/2014 3/26/2014 Passed Enrolled 60
Post Passage 5/15/2014 5/15/2014 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-1001 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM