Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Human Relations - Discrimination by a Place of Public Accommodation - Enforcement and Remedies
Sponsored by
Senators Lee, Benson, Feldman, Kagan, Kelley, King, Madaleno, Manno, Nathan-Pulliam, Pugh, Ramirez, and Raskin
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing specified persons or the Commission on Civil Rights to elect to have the claims asserted in a complaint alleging discrimination by a place of public accommodation determined in a civil action brought by the Commission; expanding the remedies available for specified discrimination; clarifying the remedies available for an unlawful employment practice; authorizing a complainant alleging specified discrimination to bring a civil action under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1269
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0642 Session: 2011 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2016
Legislative Date
1/21/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2016
Legislative Date
1/27/2016
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/20/2016 1/21/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/27/2016 1/27/2016 Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/11/2016 3/14/2016 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   20-1001, 20-1006, 20-1007, 20-1009, 20-1012, 20-1013, 20-1016 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM