Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Prosecutor and Deputy State Prosecutor - Witness Immunity - Compulsory Testimony
Sponsored by
Senators Raskin, Forehand, Frosh, Jones-Rodwell, Kittleman, Madaleno, Manno, Mathias, Middleton, Miller, Montgomery, Peters, Pugh, Ramirez, Young, and Zirkin
Status
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "prosecutor" to include the State Prosecutor or Deputy State Prosecutor under provisions of law related to compulsory witness testimony and witness immunity under specified circumstances.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0364
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2014
Legislative Date
1/16/2014
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2014
Legislative Date
1/17/2014
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2014
Legislative Date
2/17/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2014
Legislative Date
2/17/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
27
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2014
Legislative Date
2/17/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
27
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2014
Legislative Date
2/19/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
29
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2014
Legislative Date
2/20/2014
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
32
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2014
Legislative Date
3/17/2014
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2014
Legislative Date
5/15/2014
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/15/2014 1/16/2014 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/17/2014 1/17/2014 Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/14/2014 2/17/2014 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/17/2014 2/17/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 27
Senate 2/17/2014 2/17/2014 Second Reading Passed 27
Senate 2/19/2014 2/19/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 29
House 2/20/2014 2/20/2014 First Reading Judiciary 32
House 3/17/2014 3/17/2014 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/28/2014 3/31/2014 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 4/01/2014 3/25/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 61
House 4/01/2014 3/25/2014 Second Reading Passed 61
House 4/02/2014 3/26/2014 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 62
Senate 4/03/2014 3/25/2014 Returned Passed 59
Post Passage 5/15/2014 5/15/2014 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM