Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Law – Correctional Facilities – Voter Registration and Voting
Sponsored by
Senator West
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/04 at 11:00 a.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services to provide each individual who is released from a correctional facility with a voter registration application and documentation informing the individual that the individual's voting rights have been restored; requiring the State Board of Elections to adopt certain regulations establishing a program to inform eligible voters incarcerated in correctional facilities of upcoming elections and how to exercise the right to vote; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0222
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0372 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/16/2020
Legislative Date
10/16/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/19/2021
Legislative Date
1/19/2021
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 11:00 a.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Judicial Proceedings
Senate 10/16/2020 10/16/2020 Pre-filed
Text - First - Election Law – Correctional Facilities – Voter Registration and Voting
Senate 1/19/2021 1/19/2021 Hearing 2/04 at 11:00 a.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Last Updated: 1/21/2021 2:17 PM
Click to return on the top page