Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Higher Education - Unaccompanied Homeless Youth Tuition Exemption - Modification
Sponsored by
Senator Reilly
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 333
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the definition of unaccompanied homeless youth by requiring specified documentation that establishes that the child or youth has had a consistent presence in the State for at least 1 year before enrollment in a public institution of higher education that is documented by school, employment, or other records; requiring a determination of homelessness by a specified individual; and requiring a financial aid administrator to annually make a specified verification.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0297
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2015
Legislative Date
2/03/2015
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2015
Legislative Date
2/04/2015
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2015
Legislative Date
2/26/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2015
Legislative Date
2/27/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {884032/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2015
Legislative Date
2/27/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/03/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
34
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2015
Legislative Date
3/04/2015
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2015
Legislative Date
3/10/2015
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/17/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/17/2015
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2015
Legislative Date
3/27/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2015
Legislative Date
3/25/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2015
Legislative Date
3/25/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2015
Legislative Date
3/27/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2015
Legislative Date
3/27/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 333
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2015 2/03/2015 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/04/2015 2/04/2015 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/25/2015 2/26/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/27/2015 2/27/2015 Favorable with Amendments {884032/1 Report Adopted 32
Senate 2/27/2015 2/27/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 32
Senate 3/03/2015 3/03/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 34
House 3/04/2015 3/04/2015 First Reading Ways and Means 36
House 3/10/2015 3/10/2015 Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/17/2015 3/17/2015 Hearing cancelled
House 3/17/2015 3/17/2015 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/26/2015 3/27/2015 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/27/2015 3/25/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 55
House 3/27/2015 3/25/2015 Second Reading Passed 55
House 3/31/2015 3/27/2015 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 57
Senate 4/01/2015 3/27/2015 Returned Passed 54
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 333
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-106.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM