Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Civil Actions - Noneconomic Damages - Catastrophic Injury
Sponsored by
Senator Ramirez
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Altering the maximum amount of noneconomic damages that may be recovered in health care malpractice and other civil actions for a catastrophic injury under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0574 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/19/2017
Legislative Date
1/19/2017
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/19/2017
Legislative Date
1/19/2017
Action
Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Civil Actions - Noneconomic Damages - Catastrophic Injury
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2017
Legislative Date
1/24/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2017
Legislative Date
1/30/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/19/2017 1/19/2017 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/19/2017 1/19/2017 Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Civil Actions - Noneconomic Damages - Catastrophic Injury
Senate 1/24/2017 1/24/2017 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/30/2017 1/30/2017 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM